judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

E. L. ALLEN, ET AL. v. BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD TRAINMEN

Case: A-2784
A-2784
07/03/1950
Application for Writ of Error
E. L. ALLEN, ET AL.
BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD TRAINMEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/21/1950Notice of Appeal filedPetitioner
10/30/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/19/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/08/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/05/1951Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
12/21/1950Notice of Appeal filed
10/30/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/23/1950Response to Motion filed
10/19/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/08/1950Response to Petition
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brotherhood of Railroad TrainmenRespondent
David F. Thompson, Jr.Amicus Curiae
E. L. Allen, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information