Case Information: 49550 | |||
Short Caption: | GIBSON VS. DIST. CT. (WILLICK) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44437 , 50142 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A481339 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/31/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. clerk 3 06/08/07 Order-fn4: petitioner has demonstrated good cause to waive the filing fee, and so no filing fee is due.jcr | ||
05/31/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-11931 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn4[We conclude that petitioner has demonstrated good cause to waive the filing fee, and so no filing fee is due. We deny petitioner's motion for a stay as moot in light of this order. We direct the clerk to file the motion for stay, received on June 5, 2007, and the motion for waiver of fees, received on May 31, 2007.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12547 | |
06/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Waiver of Fees. | 07-11933 | |
06/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Ex Parte Motion for Stay pending Determination on Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-12243 | |
06/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition of the Real Parties in Interest to Petitioner's Ex Parte Motion for Stay Pending Determination on Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-12574 | |
07/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-13561 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/12/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Selman Breitman LLP. | 07-22670 |