Case Information: 53434 | |||
Short Caption: | CHAVEZ (JAFET) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53893 , 59445 , 65395 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C238801 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/24/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06853 | |
03/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08513 | |
06/24/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-15686 | |
06/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER the appeal in Docket No. 53434 DISMISSED and ORDER the judgment of the district court in Docket No. 53893 AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 53434/53893. | 09-29322 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30341 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. | 09-30341 |