Case Information: 49563 | |||
Short Caption: | TERRA CONTRACTING VS. JAYNES CORPORATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A480564 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Parraguirre | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/07/2007 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/04/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Law firm of Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP. | ||
06/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kevin R. Hansen, Ltd.--check no. 10880. | ||
06/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-12171 | |
06/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 3/12/07 Order and 3/15/07 Notice of Entry of Order. Due Date: 10 days | 07-12354 | |
06/07/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | 07-12505 | |
06/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Final Judgment filed in district court on March 12, 2007. | 07-12975 | |
06/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: March 15, 2007. | 07-12976 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-14188 | |
07/05/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. Settlement Conference scheduled for August 10, 2007. | 07-14689 | |
07/12/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15169 | |
08/21/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. | 07-18437 | |
08/27/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-18946 | |
08/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 07-19240 | |
10/23/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). | 07-23318 | |
10/23/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |