Case Information: 49560 | |||
Short Caption: | ORTEGA-AGUILAR (HUGO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47966 , 48268 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C205198 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/14/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/01/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12121 | |
06/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-13232 | |
08/14/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-17936 | |
08/14/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. | 07-21198 | |
10/12/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/27/07. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. (in response to 9/26/07 order-submitted by county clerk) | 07-22671 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-26683 | |
01/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00038 | |
01/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/14/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2008. | 08-00038 |