judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERGUSON VS. LANDMARK HOMES & DEV., INC. C/W 49038

Case Information: 49561
Short Caption:FERGUSON VS. LANDMARK HOMES & DEV., INC. C/W 49038Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 49038 *, 49561
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0600624Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/07/2007 / Yott, LaurieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/14/2008 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/14/2008How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/04/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Del Hardy, Esq.--check no. 11645.
06/04/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-12146
06/07/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott. 07-12514
06/28/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-14186
07/06/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-14804
07/06/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 07-14805
07/13/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-15264
07/16/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 49038/49561-cases are not consolidated. 07-15358
07/16/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-15456
08/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. we consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Transcript request due: 15 days. Single opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. Nos. 49038/49561 [07-19102]
10/02/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-21707).
11/16/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-24989).
11/16/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-24991).
12/19/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Sierra Gateway Defendants. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-27481).
12/19/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Respondents Sierra Gateway Defendants. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-27482).
12/20/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Landmark Homes, Santerra, Bawden & Serpa. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-27643).
12/20/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents Landmark Homes, Santerra, Bawden & Serpa. Nos. 49038/49561 (07-27644).
01/25/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 49038/49561 (08-01977).
09/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 14, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (NNP08G-WM/MC/NS) Nos. 49038/49561. 08-24922
10/23/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondents' Memorandum of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Answering Brief. Nos. 49038/49561 (08-27284).
10/29/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 49038/49561. 08-27756
10/30/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Response to Appellee's Supplemental Briefing. Nos. 49038/49561 (08-27879).
11/10/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent Sierra Gateway's Memorandum of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Answering Brief. Nos. 49038/49561 (08-28713). STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 11/12/08.
11/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Striking memorandum of Supplemental Authorities. As Sierra Gateway has neither sought, nor been granted permission to file a supplemental memorandum, the November 10, 2008, memorandum of supplemental authorities is hereby stricken from the record in these appeals. Nos. 49038/49561 (08-28768).
11/14/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP08G/MG/MC/NS. Nos. 49038/49561.
02/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: 14 days. Respondent's Supplemental Brief due: 14 days from the the filing of appellant's brief. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-05082).
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and file the supplemental brief. Respondents: 14 days to file their supplemental answering briefs. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-07957).
03/30/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellants. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-07957).
04/01/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondents Landmark Homes, Santerra LLC, James Bawden, John Serpa, and Lou Borrego. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-08245).
04/08/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief of the Sierra Gateway Defendants. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-08810).
05/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 49038/49561. 09-12617
06/04/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Appellant). Nos. 49038/49561 (09-14017).
06/04/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Del Hardy, Esq. - check no. 14159. Nos.49038/49561.
07/31/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 49038/49561 (09-18719).
08/05/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Bill of Costs. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-19098).
08/10/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-19498).
10/07/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Nos. 49038/49561 (09-24454).
10/27/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Costs. we decline to tax costs against the appellants in favor of respondents. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to file a motion explaining why this court should consider extending the time for respondents to file the bill of costs. Any such motion shall be filed within 10 days from the date of this order. If no such motion is filed, no costs will be allowed in this appeal. Appellants shall have 5 days from the service of any such motion to file a response. Nos. 49038/49561 (09-26223).
11/10/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-26283
11/10/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/18/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2009. 09-26283