Case Information: 49543 | |||
Short Caption: | WASHOE COUNTY VS. SMITH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0502769 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/07/2007 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/03/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson LLP--check no. 62449. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11896 | |
06/07/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 07-12513 | |
06/18/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13277 | |
06/18/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Docketing Statement. | 07-13279 | |
06/20/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on parties and settlement judge. | 07-13489 | |
07/06/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-14800 | |
07/25/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 6, 2007. | 07-16335 | |
08/07/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-17300 | |
08/15/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-18023 | |
08/30/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-19248 | |
11/13/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24698 | |
11/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. | 07-24699 | |
12/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 14, 2008. | 07-27207 | |
01/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-00985 | |
01/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. | 08-01267 | |
02/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 3/14/08. | 08-03432 | |
03/13/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-06352 | |
02/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-02988 | |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/29/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court order granting the petition for judicial review." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-13358 | |
06/23/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-15014 | |
06/23/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Publication of Order of Affirmance. | 09-15682 | |
07/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 24, 2009. | 09-15014 | |
12/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Publish. | 09-30638 |