Case Information: 55259 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN (MATTHEW) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C256996 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-01247 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/20/09. | 10-03155 | |
02/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-04839 | |
02/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Fast track statement and appendix due: March 25, 2010. | 10-05000 | |
03/24/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-07771 | |
03/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol I. | 10-07772 | |
03/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol II. | 10-07773 | |
04/05/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-08733 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14752 | |
07/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15773 | |
07/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 9, 2010. | 10-15773 |