judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUXTON VS. BUXTON

Case Information: 31537
Short Caption:BUXTON VS. BUXTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D195909Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/18/1997 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/29/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/15/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Clarence Edwin Gamble - Check No. 3566.
12/15/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
12/18/1997Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/11/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
05/14/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Craig A. Hoppe re: Status of several pending Settlement conferences. (Nos. 31538, 31537, 31155, 30599, 31529, 30242, and 30274.)
05/18/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement.
06/08/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document. The original and seven copies returned, unfiled with letter.
06/16/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/06/1998Other Other. Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Richard J. Buxton hereby substitutes Radford J. Smith of the law firm of Smith & Wachsman as attorneys in the place and stead of the law firm of Michael Davidson.
08/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a), shall have 90 days from this order to file and serve the Opening Brief and Appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from service of the Opening Brief to file and serve the Answering Brief. Appellant shall then have 10 days from service of the Answering Brief to file and serve any Reply Brief. Extensions of this briefing schedule will be granted only by court order in extraordinary cases that present unforeseeable circumstances justifying an extension of time. An extension request not based upon such circumstances may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel.
11/10/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request with this court. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the immediate imposition of sanctions and dismissal of this appeal.
11/16/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address of Counsel for Appellant. Law Office of Clarence E. Gamble.
11/16/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
11/18/1998Other Other. Filed Certificate of Compliance with NRAP 9(a). (No transcripts requested.)
11/18/1998Other Other. Filed Certificate of Mailing (Motion for Extension of Time).
12/15/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant has filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file the Opening Brief. Appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, serve and file the Opening Brief and Appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2).
12/18/1998MotionFiled Motion. Second Motion for Extension of Time in which to file Opening Brief.
03/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant Aurora Buxton: Edward G. Marshall hereby appears as new legal counsel.
03/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Proceedings of 11/18/97. To Court Reporter: Family court Transcript Video Services.
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion by Appellant Buxton for Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal.
03/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 8, 1999, Appellant filed an emergency motion for stay of judgment pending appeal. We are not persuaded that appellant has demonstrated her entitlement to relief at this time. We deny Appellant's emergency motion. Appellant shall within 30 days of the date of this order file and serve the Opening Brief and Appendix or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. fn2[Appellant's December 18, 1998, motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot.]
04/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time within which to file Opening Brief.
04/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 18, 1997. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper.
05/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve and file the Opening Brief and Appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). No further extensions shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. On March 5, 1999, attorney Edward G. Marshall filed a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant and stated that a notice of substitution of attorneys would be forthcoming. To date, no such notice has been filed. Pending proper withdrawal, attorney Gamble shall remain listed as counsel on this court's docket and may be held responsible for all matters presented herein.
05/17/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned unfiled with letter, the original and two copies of Appellant's Opening Brief which contained Appendix.
05/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/24/99.)
05/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
07/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address for attorney Radford Smith.
07/20/1999MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief.
07/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent shall have until August 19, 1999, to file the Answering Brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2).
08/23/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (mailed on 8/19/99).
08/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix.
09/23/1999Other Other. Filed Appellant's Waiver of Right to file Reply Brief.
12/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
12/29/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13404
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13696
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13696