judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2783
A-2783
07/03/1950
Application for Writ of Error
OTIS BLANKENBURG, ET AL.
HUMBLE OIL REFINING COMPANY, HUMBLE OIL REFINING COMPANY AND E. R. WYATT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/11/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/11/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1950Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/14/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/05/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/05/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/21/1954Miscellaneous letter
01/11/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/11/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/10/1951Opinion issued
11/09/1950Reply to Response
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/14/1950Reply to Response
07/11/1950Additional Copies received
07/05/1950Response to Petition
07/05/1950Response to Petition
07/03/1950Additional Copies received
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Otis Blankenburg, et al.Petitioner
Humble Oil Refining CompanyRespondent
Humble Oil Refining Company and E. R. WyattRespondent
Vinson, Elkins and WeemsAmicus Curiae
Looney, Clark and MoorheadAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information