Case Information: 49545 | |||
Short Caption: | WILD GAME NG VS. WMS GAMING C/W 49239 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 49239 *, 49545 | Related Case(s): | 49239 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0501900 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/07/2007 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. | ||
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kevin J. Mirch Attorney--check no. 4181. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11901 | |
06/07/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | 07-12512 | |
06/15/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13137 | |
06/15/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-13138 | |
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Amended Case Appeal Statement. | 07-13935 | |
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 07-13963 | |
07/18/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-15650 | |
08/20/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-18350 | |
09/12/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Appellant's Motion for Consolidation of Nevada Supreme Court Docket No. 49545 w/Nevada Supreme Court Docket No. 49239. Nos. 49239/49545-cases are not consolidated. | 07-20093 | |
09/12/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 07-20094 | |
09/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Indication of No Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Consolidation of Dockets. Nos. 49239/49545. (These cases are not consolidated.) | 07-20331 | |
09/21/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. on Settlement Judge Levitt of motion for consolidation. | 07-20839 | |
10/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Nos. 49239/49545 (07-22437). | ||
10/29/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 49239 and 49545 (07-23615). | ||
11/08/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 49239/49545. (07-24411) | ||
12/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Wild Game NG dba Siena Hotel Spa and Casino in Nevada Supreme Court Docket No. 49545 and Nevada Supreme Court Docket No. 49239. Nos. 49239/49545. (07-27102) | ||
12/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition/Response to Counsel for Appellant's Motion to Withdraw. Nos. 49239/49545 (07-27537). | ||
02/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Conclusion of Settlement Conference Proceedings and Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove the firm of Mirch & Mirch from the docket of this appeal. Notice of Appearance (counsel for appellant) due: 30 days. Settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and requesting of transcripts shall remain stayed pending further order of this court and receipt of appellant's repsonse to this order. Nos. 49239/49545 (08-04469). | ||
02/26/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Robert Hager, Esq. of Hager & Hearne in place and stead of Mirch & Mirch. Nos. 49239/49545 (08-04724). | ||
03/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 49545/49239 (08-06109). | ||
03/27/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. "Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, these consolidated appeals are dismissed." NRAP 42(b). Nos. 49239/49545. SNP08-TH | 08-07651 | |
03/27/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |