Case Information: 49540 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. LEWIS (RICKY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49998 , 56052 , 56554 , 60605 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213093 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-11881 | |
07/10/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Law Office of JoNell Thomas, JoNell Thomas, Esq. and Megan C. Hoffman, Esq. | 07-15024 | |
07/13/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-15256 | |
07/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-15257 | |
07/27/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-16578 | |
07/27/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-16580 | |
07/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. | 07-16581 | |
08/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. | 07-17052 | |
08/15/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change in Status of Counsel for Respondent. (Effective 8/27/07 JoNell Thomas joins the office of Special Public Defender and will retain her appointment as attorney of record for respondent.) | 07-18035 | |
09/10/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Full Briefing. This court has concluded that this appeal warrants full, expedited briefing. State's opening brief due: 20 days; respondent's answering brief due: 20 days from the date of service of the State's brief; and reply brief, if any, due: 20 days from the date of service of respondent's answering brief. Fn1[Counsel need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix previously filed in this court.] | 07-19796 | |
10/03/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-21864 | |
10/15/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-22751 | |
11/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-24693 | |
11/29/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 13, 2007. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on November 19, 2007. | 07-25758 | |
11/29/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 07-25146 | |
03/13/2008 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Dismissed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Gibbons/Maupin/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. EN BANC. | 08-06247 | |
04/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-07942 | |
04/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2008. | 08-07942 |