Case Information: 49539 | |||
Short Caption: | LOPEZ (FRANCISCO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224144 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/23/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-11846 | |
06/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. | 07-13665 | |
06/26/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 21 and 22, 2007. Court Reporter: Blanca I. Cano. | 07-13927 | |
06/26/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-13932 | |
07/13/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have until July 16, 2007, to file and serve the docketing statement. | 07-15289 | |
08/30/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to File Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement. Due: 10 days. Counsel cautioned. | 07-19199 | |
12/03/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Imposing Sanctions. We conclude that counsel's continuing failure to comply with our appellate rules and our orders warrants the imposition of sanctions. Martin W. Hart: 15 days from the date of this order to personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide proof of payment. Appellant 10 days to, file the docketing statement in compliance with NRAP 14, request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a), and file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Counsel cautioned. | 07-25961 | |
12/13/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Payment of Sanction. Received an email from Kathleen Harrington that the sanction of $500 has been paid by Martin Hart - check no. 0421. | ||
01/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Additional Sanctions. The conditional imposition of additional sanctions. Mr. Hart shall, within 15 day to pay $1,000.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. However, this sanction shall be automatically vacated if Mr. Hart files and serves the docketing statement, transcript request form, opening brief and appendix or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within 10 days from the date of this order. We caution Mr. Hart that failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions including referral to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 105. Fn2 [ If no transcript is to be requested, appellant shall file and serve a certificate to that effect within the same time period.] Fn3[ Any motion for extension of time shall explain the reasons for Mr. Hart's failure to file the missing documents in a timely manner and shall set forth sufficient cause for the requested extension of time] | 08-02176 | |
01/28/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-01843 | |
02/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Docketing Statement, Request for Transcript, and Opening Brief. | 08-03788 | |
02/19/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-03795 | |
02/26/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Receipt of Copy for Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief, Appellant's Opening Brief, Docketing Statement, and Appellant's Application for Extension of Time. | 08-04768 | |
02/27/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall file the trancript request form, opening brief, and appendix received on February 14, 2008. As the docketing statement was timely filed on January 28, 2008, this portion of the motion is denied as moot. | 08-04784 | |
02/27/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/21/07 and 2/22/07. To Court Reporter: Blanca Cano. | 08-03780 | |
02/27/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-03792 | |
02/27/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-03793 | |
03/26/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-07506 | |
05/14/2008 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
05/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13128 | |
05/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-26690 | |
11/12/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-27696 | |
11/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2008. | 08-27696 |