Case Information: 55256 | |||
Short Caption: | CHACON VS. LV-CLARK CO. LIBRARY DIST. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A550033 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/14/2010 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/30/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01198 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/14/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 10-01252 | |
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Glenn Schepps check no. 4837. | ||
02/04/2010 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. | 10-03215 | |
02/18/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04461 | |
03/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-05543 | |
03/10/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-06314 | |
03/22/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-07526 | |
06/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-14909 | |
06/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. | 10-14910 | |
06/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-16621 | |
07/23/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-19066 | |
07/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 10-19773 | |
07/30/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-01609 | |
01/31/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Request To Tax Costs Against Appellant Pursuant To NRAP 39. | 11-02888 | |
02/16/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $50.01. | 11-05039 | |
02/16/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $50.01. | 11-05041 | |
02/16/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/02/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 25, 2011. | 11-05041 |