judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HORNE (KENNETH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49576
Short Caption:HORNE (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189004Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/16/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/06/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-12295
06/11/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 6/8/07. Due Date: 10 days 07-12670
06/18/2007Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 8, 2007. 07-13318
06/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-14254
08/16/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 07-18136
08/16/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. fn11[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] 07-26687
01/04/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-00039
01/04/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/14/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2008. 08-00039