judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOOPER (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49575
Short Caption:HOOPER (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52427
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0701007Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/24/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-12279
06/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy of the judgment of conviction within 5 days from the date of entry of the judgment of conviction to the clerk of this court. 07-14252
07/26/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment filed in district court on July 23, 2007. 07-16424
08/10/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. District Court Order due: 35 days. 07-17659
08/16/2007Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 13, 2007 appointing the Nevada State Public Defender's office as counsel for appellant. 07-18078
08/16/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days 07-18079
08/31/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/26/07, 5/14/07, 5/22/07, 5/23/07 and 7/23/07. Court Reporter: Donna Bath, County Clerk. Filed in district court on: August 2, 2007. 07-19368
08/31/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-19370
09/05/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (First Request) 07-19455
09/10/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/26/07, 5/14/07, 5/22/07, 5/23/07 and 7/23/07. Court Reporters: Kim Manzonie and Linda Eldridge. 07-19857
09/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. as Moot. We note the transcripts were timely received and filed on September 10, 2007. 07-20636
12/14/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 14, 2008. 07-27218
01/14/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-00905
01/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due February 13, 2008. 08-01281
02/13/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-03671
02/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 14, 2008. Counsel admonished. 08-04141
03/18/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time in Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. 08-06731
03/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We again admonish appellant's counsel for his utter disregard of this court's prior orders and admonishment. We grant appellant's motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on March 18, 2008. Respondent shall have 30 days to file and serve the answering brief. 08-07555
03/27/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-06733
03/27/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 08-06735
03/31/2008Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Dismissal of Court, and, Judicial Complaint. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/17/08). 08-07828
04/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person document received on March 31, 2008. Appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. 08-09599
04/17/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Dismissal of Court, and, Judicial Complaint.
04/30/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 28, 2008. 08-10741
05/07/2008Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Letter dated 05/01/08. 08-11424
05/07/2008Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Letter to the Court: Coterminuous Judicial Complaint. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 05/27/08). 08-11425
05/20/2008Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Letter to the Court: Coterminous Judicial Complaint. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 05/27/08). 08-12615
05/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . We decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in this case in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on May 7, and May 20, 2008, and any future proper person documents submitted in this appeal. 08-13270
05/27/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter to the Court: Coterminuous Judicial Complaint received on May 7, 2008.
05/27/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter to the Court: Coterminous Judicial Complaint received on May 20, 2008.
05/29/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 08-13576
06/04/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 27, 2008. 08-14130
07/03/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 08-16965
07/03/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Attorney for Respodnent. Michael Bongard, Deputy Attorney General, in place of Joseph W. Long, Deputy Attorney General. 08-17057
07/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 28, 2008. 08-17820
07/28/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-19441
08/28/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 26, 2008. 08-22185
09/26/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-25030
10/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-27291
10/24/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/04/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP 09-05554
03/31/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-06778
03/31/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2009. 09-06778