Case Information: 49566 | |||
Short Caption: | FRIEDMAN (KENNETH) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43260 , 43686 , 44425 , 48390 , 48489 , 50569 , 50580 , 57688 , 63162 , 63164 , 63867 , 65639 , 65891 , 80971 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190974 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/04/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. | 07-12187 | |
06/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Michael Cherry sat in district court proceedings. | 07-12669 | |
07/05/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. | 07-14605 | |
07/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Relief. On June 27, 2007, this court received a proper person supplement. In light of this court's order denying the petition, the relief requested in the supplement is hereby denied as moot. | 07-16541 | |
08/17/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 07-18203 | |
09/11/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-18552 | |
09/11/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |