Case Information: 49548 | |||
Short Caption: | HOWARD (CEDRIC) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53914 , 54182 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C093390 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/24/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-11906 | |
06/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-13227 | |
08/24/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-18798 | |
08/24/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-10277 | |
06/18/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15547 | |
07/15/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-17891 | |
07/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2008. | 08-17891 | |
12/17/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed August 15, 2008 and placed on the docket December 12, 2008 as Case No. 08-7702. | 08-32036 | |
03/02/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | 09-05306 |