Case Information: 49547 | |||
Short Caption: | ROSS (LEE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228553 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-11903 | |
07/09/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-14957 | |
07/09/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-14960 | |
07/19/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-15826 | |
07/19/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-15828 | |
09/06/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. | 07-19567 | |
10/02/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-19698 | |
10/02/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/12/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2007. | 07-19698 |