Case Information: 49556 | |||
Short Caption: | COLEMAN (STEVE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39776 , 42051 , 43262 , 45157 , 54078 , 69483 , 69570 , 69570-COA , 69720 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C181527 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/01/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12110 | |
06/01/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Michael Cherry sat in district court proceedings. | 07-12111 | |
07/24/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-16177 | |
08/21/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-16537 | |
08/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/28/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2007. | 07-16537 |