judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TALLA VS. ELIADES

Case Information: 47969
Short Caption:TALLA VS. ELIADESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48063 , 48172 , 48316
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A469231
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A471174
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/08/2006 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kummer firm - check no. 58155.
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18207
09/08/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/20/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19420
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20451
01/22/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 47969/48063-cases are not consolidated. 07-01633
01/30/2007Other Returned Mail. Set. Conf. Status Report filed 01/22/07, addressed to Gentile Depalma Ltd. re-mailed to corrected address. Nos. 47969/48063.
02/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 07-03035
02/23/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal. 07-04418
03/02/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. And Remanding to the District Court. Pursuant to the settlement conference, appellants' motion for voluntarily dismissal and cause appearing, " . . . we dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings to alter, amend, or vacate its order or judgment as necessary for the parties to fulfill the terms of their settlement agreement. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellants may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-05046
03/02/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.