judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLE (WYATT) VS. STATE C/W 47968/47971

Case Information: 47970
Short Caption:COLE (WYATT) VS. STATE C/W 47968/47971Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 47968 *, 47970, 47971
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 2057Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18205
09/26/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." NNP07-NB/JH/RP. Nos. 47968/47970/47971. 06-19709
10/05/2006Other Returned Mail. Order Dimissing Appeal addressed to Wyatt James Cole returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 47968/47970/47971.
10/24/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20956
10/24/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/31/2006Other Returned Mail. Remitittur addressed to Wyatt Cole returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 47968/47970/47971.
11/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 25, 2006. 06-20956