judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

G.M.F. VS. GLENNON

Case Information: 34811
Short Caption:G.M.F. VS. GLENNONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A346082Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley firm-check no. 71894.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08559
09/10/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. (Sat in district court proceedings).
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. ALL orders filed 8/24/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 8/24/99. 99-09428
12/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 27, 1999. 99-13082
01/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-00368
01/10/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-00370
01/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK 00-01041
01/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.