judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLETTA BASSIL V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Information: 10-CV-1018
Short Caption:CARLETTA BASSIL V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB13950-10Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarletta BassilYPro SeN
AppelleeD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Lisa J. DesselYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 9, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
09/29/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 26, 2010, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcripts filed in the Superior Court, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, but it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
09/29/2010DISMISSED
10/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/REINSTATE (opp) (elp)
10/21/2010WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
10/21/2010RECEIVED_-SR #1 (11-pgs/tape 7/1/10)
10/21/2010RECEIVED- #2 (3-pgs/tape 8/9/10 proc.)w/cd attached
11/02/2010RECEIVED - APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EVICTION
11/02/2010TMC - appellant's (LODGED) motion for stay
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal, and it appearing that the motion for appeal transcript has been filed, and the lodged motion to stay the judgment of possession pending appeal, and that transcript have been filed with this Court, it is ORDERED that the motion to reinstate is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall recall the mandate. It is (MORE)
11/03/2010MANDATE RECALLED
11/03/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged motion for stay. It is (MORE)
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
11/03/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to stay the order pending appeal is denied as appellant has failed to make the requisite showing for a stay. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (D.C. 1987) (citing In re Antioch Univ., 418 A.2d 105, 109 (D.C. 1980). It is
11/03/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C.App.R. 13 (a). (RD,BR,NW) (kt)
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11-pgs/tape 7/1/10)
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (3-pgs/tape 8/9/10 proc.) w/cd
11/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/05/2010RECORD INDEX
11/05/2010RECORD COPIES
11/05/2010APPEARANCE- of Lisa J. Dessel on behalf of aple
11/09/2010APPEARANCE of Lisa J. Dessel as counsel for aple.
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY ***CONSTRUED as both a motion to reconsider 11/3/10 order and a motion for extension of time to file her brief *****SEE 11/22/10 ORDER LW
11/22/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MTOION TO RECONSIDER the denial of her previous motion to stay IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
11/22/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S BRIEF and limited appendix shall be filed W/N 90 DAYS from the date of this order and appellee's brief shall be filed w/n 30 days thereafter... It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any oder of this court, including this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/o further notice for lack of prosecution. (RDBRNW) (kt)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF *(opp) (elp)
03/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 8, 2011. (JAC) elp
04/08/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
04/08/2011APPENDIX
06/23/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix were filed with this court on April 8, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before May 16, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/25/11.
07/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/25/11.
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Appellee)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/10/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledOrder Granting petitioner's motion for dismissal.
11/23/2011FiledDismissed
12/15/2011FiledMandate
04/17/2014FiledArchived