judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00619-CR
05-82-00619-CR
05/11/1982
Indecency with a Child
Danny Marshall Morgan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/19/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/08/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/20/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
11/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/19/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/08/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/04/1983Clerks record filed
05/11/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Morgan, Danny MarshallCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 291st District Court
F77-9694-LKU
5 Years TDC