judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00336-CV
01-82-00336-CV
05/11/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Ames, Nancy
Great Southern Bank
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1984Petition for writ of error from trial courtGrant motion
10/06/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
08/04/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
07/15/1983Motion for rehearing filed
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/27/1983Submitted
03/10/1983Submission
01/12/1983Brief filed
12/30/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/13/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/12/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/04/1982Motion strans disposedGrant motion
11/04/1982Supplemental transcript filed
10/21/1982Brief filed
10/21/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/18/1982Motion for leave to file strans
09/27/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/16/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/30/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/29/1982Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/29/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/29/1982Statement of facts filed
07/29/1982Supplemental transcript filed
07/12/1982Motion for leave to file strans
07/12/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/10/1982Transcript filed
05/27/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/11/1982Extend time to file record
02/01/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantVan E. McFarland
StateAppelleeCarl Theobold Schultz
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Thomas R. Phillips
1,072,420