judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00597-CR
05-82-00597-CR
05/12/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Charles Porter
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/31/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/01/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/19/1983Letter issued by the court
10/19/1983Letter received
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1983Letter issued by the court
06/02/1983Letter received
01/31/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/01/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/01/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/04/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/24/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/20/1982Reporters record filed
07/20/1982Clerks record filed
05/12/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/29/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Porter, CharlesCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
F82-76405-JS
Life & $51.00 Court Costs