judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00593-CR
05-82-00593-CR
05/12/1982
Theft
Earnest Cox
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/28/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/12/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
09/06/1983Reply to petition for discretionary review filed
08/25/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
08/17/1983Case forwarded to higher court
08/12/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
07/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/25/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/27/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/28/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/07/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/18/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/07/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/1982Reporters record filed
08/09/1982Clerks record filed
05/12/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cox, EarnestCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
F82-75840-LS
Life and $51.00 Court Costs