judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERMANSKI (GREGORY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47963
Short Caption:HERMANSKI (GREGORY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38028 , 41405 , 47011 , 55718 , 58688 , 58871 , 64951 , 65298 , 65389 , 65616 , 65673 , 68392 , 68392-COA , 80288 , 80288-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C167783Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18133
10/03/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-20317
10/31/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-21158
10/31/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/07/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2006. 06-21158
11/08/2006Other Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to Gregory Hermanski remailed to same address with aka Robert James Day added to the addressee's name.