judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00138-CV
08-82-00138-CV
05/14/1982
Miscellaneous civil
MacWhyte Company, et al
Morales, Calixto
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
02/10/1983Mandate Issued
01/03/1983Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
12/29/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/29/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/17/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/15/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/01/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/28/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
09/17/1982Submission
09/17/1982Submitted
06/25/1982Brief Filed
06/09/1982Brief Filed
06/03/1982Brief Filed
05/21/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
05/20/1982Statement of Facts Filed
05/14/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
05/14/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/10/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
83rd District Court
Pecos
4074