judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00145-CR
08-82-00145-CR
05/13/1982
Theft
Ducrea, Harvey Lemont
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
11/18/1983Mandate Issued
11/15/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
10/24/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewRefused
06/29/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/28/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/01/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/16/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1983Submitted
03/16/1983Submission
09/30/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
09/29/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
09/24/1982Brief Filed
09/08/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/04/1982Brief Filed
08/04/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/22/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/26/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/13/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
36225
10 Years + $5,000.