Case: 10-13-00244-CV
10-13-00244-CV
07/25/2013
Interlocutory
Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services
Leeann Huse
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/2013 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
11/01/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
08/26/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/2021 | Letter to trial court clerk for return of record | | |||
08/26/2014 | Case stored | | |||
08/26/2014 | Mandate issued | | |||
05/08/2014 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
05/08/2014 | Judgment Issued | | |||
05/08/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Dismissed |
| ||
05/08/2014 | Submitted | | |||
04/15/2014 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
11/12/2013 | Reply brief filed | | |||
11/01/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/01/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
09/25/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
09/17/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
08/26/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
08/16/2013 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
08/08/2013 | Reporters record filed | | |||
07/31/2013 | Clerks record filed | | |||
07/25/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
07/02/2013 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/27/2020 | Case Stored | Send 6 year letter in cv cases |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services | Appellant | Thomas A. Albright |
Huse, Leeann | Appellee | Jerry Scarbrough Michele Barber Chimene |
Trial Court Information
77th District Court
Limestone
Honorable Patrick H. Simmons
30,095-A
Debra K. Cannon