judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00598-CR
05-82-00598-CR
05/12/1982
Robbery
Thomas, James Wesley
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/14/1984Mandate Issued
10/26/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/12/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/28/1983Submitted
05/04/1983Submission
02/11/1983Brief Filed
01/24/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/24/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/26/1982Brief Filed
10/07/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/29/1982Order Atty. to File Brief Disposed
08/20/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
05/12/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
f75-2095-JL
99 yrs TDC