judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE (ALLEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47964
Short Caption:WHITE (ALLEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41087 , 47817 , 48581 , 49557
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179835Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/06/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18135
09/14/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Order filed 8/30/06 and District Court Order filed 9/11/06. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Vacate Illegal Sentence filed in district court on 8/30/06 & Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Vacate Illegal Sentence filed in district court on 9/11/06 (submitted in response to Notice dated 9/14/06). 06-19513
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-20498
11/06/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-22609
11/06/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/22/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-01589
02/16/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-03006
02/16/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2007. 07-03006