judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00146-CV
08-82-00146-CV
05/14/1982
Workers Compensation
Texas Employers' Insurance Association
Terry, Kenneth Lee
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/06/1984Shuck purged
11/09/1983No description available.
10/31/1983No description available.
10/06/1983Mandate Issued
09/27/1983No description available.
09/23/1983No description available.
09/19/1983No description available.
09/19/1983No description available.
08/22/1983No description available.
08/15/1983No description available.
07/27/1983No description available.
07/27/1983No description available.
07/27/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/03/1982Submitted
11/03/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/1982No description available.
10/06/1982Submission
08/30/1982Brief Filed
08/25/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/28/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/18/1982Brief Filed
06/15/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/26/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/21/1982Statement of Facts Filed
05/21/1982Transcript Filed
05/14/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
05/14/1982Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Reeves
11,159