judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00082-CV
02-82-00082-CV
05/14/1982
Workers Compensation
United States Fire Insurance Company
Monn, Carolyn J.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/02/1983Writ DisposedRefused
01/24/1983Writ Filed
12/23/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/30/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable John E Bradshaw
8102