Case: D-2709
D-2709
07/28/1992
App Writ of Error
JENARD GROSS
JERALD A. TURBOFF, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/28/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Rehearing filed | | |
11/04/1992 | Motion to supplement transcript disposed | Filing granted | RESPONDENT'S MO | |
11/04/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | W/Resp's mo to supp transcript granted. | |
09/03/1992 | Petitioner's reply brief | | | |
08/13/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/11/1992 | Motion to supplement transcript | Respondent's motion to supplement transcript | | |
08/11/1992 | Reply to Response | | | |
07/28/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
07/28/1992 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to resp/atty - req. he file mo supp record with reply and include cert/cc cost bond on appeal filed in TC on 9/6/90 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/07/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TURBOFF, RONALD A. | Respondent | Mr. Dennis G. Herlong |
GROSS, JENARD | Petitioner | Ms. Solace Kirkland Southwick Mr. Gary C. Miller Mr. Ronald E. Cook |
TURBOFF INVESTMENTS, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Dennis G. Herlong |
TURBOFF, Trustee, JERALD A. | Respondent | Mr. Dennis G. Herlong |
JERALD A. TURBOFF, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Dennis G. Herlong |
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed & Remanded
833 SW2d 235, 05-21-92
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOE L. DRAUGHN
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Russell T. Lloyd
87-50975