judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARNETT P. MORGAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 79-CV-0588
Short Caption:GARNETT P. MORGAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9940-75Filed Date:05/16/1979

Opening Event Date:05/16/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/28/1979Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/06/1980
Argued/Submitted:09/30/1980
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGarnett P. Morgan N
Jack H. OlenderNN
AppellantGarnett P. Morgan N
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORGAN, GARNETT P. ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
05/16/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/28/1979FiledRecord Completed
06/06/1980FiledBriefing Completed
09/30/1980FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition