judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCGINNIS VS. JOHNSON

Case Information: 34610
Short Caption:MCGINNIS VS. JOHNSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389162Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Crockett firm check no. 10172.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07086
08/10/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09221
11/04/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-10809
01/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. 00-00653
01/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-00714
01/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
01/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. 00-00819