judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROD FOX v. WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC.

Case Heading (S-07-0058)
Case Number:S-07-0058Case Docketed On:03/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Uniform Commercial Code (Title 34.1)
Short Title:ROD FOX v. WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC.
Full Title:ROD FOX, d/b/a FIBERTECTION CORPORATION, a FOX COMPANY, Appellant (Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant), v. WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC., a Corporate Entity, Appellee (Defendant/Counter-Claimant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRod FoxKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeWheeler Electric, Inc.Michael Dean Gaffney

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 171
Citation:169 P.3d 875

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/30/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/11/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/26/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
07/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts and Exhibit Lists; Volumes III - V, Trial ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/01/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/31/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/26/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/21/07 by Obrecht.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal