judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AARON EUGENE SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0160)
Case Number:S-07-0160Case Docketed On:07/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:AARON EUGENE SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AARON EUGENE SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAaron Eugene SmithMegan L. Hayes
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 98
Citation:190 P.3d 522 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/18/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other. Received copy of district court order allowing extension of time. (Court Reporter has 5 day extension)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Second - remaining transcript filed)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Megan Hayes on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/09/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel, Public DefenderMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/28/2007Motion - Stay - other. Motion for stay of appeal.MotionStay - otherFinal
08/29/2007Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
09/05/2007Event - Phone Call - Judge Donnell called requesting copy of any order entered staying proceedings based on motion for new trial. FAXed copy of order of 8/29/07 this date.EventPhone CallFinal
09/28/2007Event - Phone Call. Called the Clerk's Office to check on status of remand. There is a scheduling order with deadlines of October 5, 2007.EventPhone CallFinal
10/29/2007Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of motion in district court. Ms. Hayes indicated that Judge Donnell had done a decision letter denying, but had asked the prosecutor to prepare an order for signature. She'll follow up with him.EventPhone CallFinal
11/05/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellant indicating that she has Judge Donnell's order and is sending copy today, and that the court reporter has indicated that she will have the transcript done by 11/16/07.EventPhone CallFinal
11/06/2007Correspondence - Incoming - from Megan Hayes indicating that the order denying motion has been filed and the transcript will be filed by 11/16/07.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/06/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - order denying defendant's motion for new trial filed 11/2/07.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
11/06/2007Order - Lifting Stay - and setting briefing scheduleOrderLifting StayFinal
11/21/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
01/29/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/19/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volumes III-V, transcripts; volume VI, exhibits and confidential envelopes.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Megan Hayes for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/01/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Megan L. Hayes for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/04/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/5/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal