judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STACEY L. BUSBY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1017
Short Caption:STACEY L. BUSBY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4192-02Filed Date:08/14/2010

Opening Event Date:08/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStacey L. Busby YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 12/20/10
11/29/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 20, 2010. (By: JAC)
12/21/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
12/21/2010RECEIVED- aplt's brief and appendix
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/28/2010LIMITED APPENDIX
01/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 24, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/10/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Reid,Belson
09/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Reid, *Associate Judge, Retired, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
10/24/2011FiledMandate
11/02/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc and request for new appointment of counsel (Served USAO) Other (Appellant)
12/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file petition for reh/reh en banc on or before December 19, 2011. Further Ordered that appellant's motion for appointment of counsel is denied.
12/21/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
01/12/2012LodgedMotion To Appoint Counsel for Petition for Rehearing and for filing for Cert. (Appellant)
02/06/2012LodgedMiscellaneous Supplement to Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (Appellant)
03/09/2012FiledOrder Denying Appellant's pro se petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.