judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OKINO VS. SAL SAGEV HOTEL CO, INC.

Case Information: 47972
Short Caption:OKINO VS. SAL SAGEV HOTEL CO, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A495399Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/08/2006 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John R. Lusk - check no. 1090.
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18208
09/08/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/18/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19184
09/28/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/10/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-20716
10/30/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-22089
10/30/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-22090
11/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-22578
11/06/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.