judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BONCORE ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. AGUILLARD C/W 47418

Case Information: 47973
Short Caption:BONCORE ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. AGUILLARD C/W 47418Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 47418 *, 47973
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A487877Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2006 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from J. Michael McGroarty - check no. 22957.
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18229
09/06/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/14/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18991
09/20/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-19419
09/21/2006Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondent Industrial Relations. 06-19438
10/03/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20266
10/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 24, 2006. Nos. 47418/47973-cases are not consolidated. 06-21131
10/30/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 47418/47973-cases are not consolidated. 06-22096
12/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. J. Michael McGroarty, Chtd. 06-25548
02/06/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[Upon completion of briefing, this appeal may be consolidated with the related appeal in No. 47418. If the parties believe these appeals should be consolidated for all appellate purposes, they may file an appropriate motion or stipulation.] 07-03032
02/28/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 07-04848
03/01/2007MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 47418/47973. 07-04948
03/09/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/23/06. To Court Reporter: Eighth Judicial District Court, Dept. VIII. 07-05620
03/27/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 07-06863
05/09/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. (Transferred to no. 47418 per 06/25/07 order.) 07-10304
05/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Appellant shall have until June 7, 2007 to file the opening brief. Nos. 47418/47973 (07-11084).
06/12/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. Nos. 47418/47973 [07-12832]
06/21/2007AppendixReceived Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix (six volumes) labeled as Vols. 3 through 8. Nos. 47418/47973 (07-13544).
06/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 9, 2007, to file and serve the opening brief in these consolidated appeals. Appellant filed a two-volume appendix in Docket No. 47973 only. Thereafter, on June 21, 2007, appellant submitted volumes 3 through 8 of the appendix for filing in both Docket No. 47418 and Docket No. 47973. As these appeals have now been consolidated, the clerk shall transfer volumes 1 and 2 of the appendix from Docket No. 47973 to Docket No. 47418, the lead case. Further, the clerk shall file volumes 3 through 8 of the appendix, received on June 21, 2007, in Docket No. 47418. In the event appellant's opening brief in these consolidated appeals cites to documents that are not included in volumes 1 through 8 of the appendix, appellant shall file and serve, with the opening brief, a supplemental appendix. Nos. 47418/47973 [07-13788]
06/25/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 and 2. (Transferred to 47418 from 47973 per 06/25/07 order.) Nos. 47418/47973. (Filed in 47418 only.) [07-13892]
06/25/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix (six volumes) Vols. 3 through 8. Nos. 47418/47973. (Filed in 47418 only.) [07-13544]
07/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief. Opening brief due: 10 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of these appeals as abandoned. Nos. 47418/47973. (07-16158)
08/02/2007MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Withdraw Appeals. Nos. 47418/47973. (07-16991)
08/22/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "These appeals are dismissed." NRAP 42(b). Nos. 47418/47973. 07-18573
08/22/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.