judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00338-CV
01-82-00338-CV
05/13/1982
Automobile Personal Injury
Dresser Industries, Inc. et al
William Pinkard et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/09/1983No description available.
07/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/03/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Submission
09/30/1982Brief filed
09/30/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/16/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/19/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/12/1982Motion strans disposedGrant motion
08/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/30/1982Brief filed
07/16/1982Motion for leave to file strans
07/08/1982Brief filed
07/08/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/11/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/13/1982Statement of facts filed
05/13/1982Transcript filed
05/10/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/09/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
78 1010