judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FUENTES (CRYSTAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47967
Short Caption:FUENTES (CRYSTAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45221 , 45412 , 45611 , 49232 , 53563 , 65376 , 67193
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204618Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18203
10/09/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-20621
11/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-21179
11/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 6, 2006. 06-21179