judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORTEGA-AGUILAR (HUGO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47966
Short Caption:ORTEGA-AGUILAR (HUGO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48268 , 49560
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C205198Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18140
09/26/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have received all proper person documents, and conclude that to relief is warranted.] NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-19675
10/24/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20953
10/24/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2006. 06-20953