judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOODRICH VS. GOODRICH (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 47961
Short Caption:GOODRICH VS. GOODRICH (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D287060Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/07/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael J. Warhola Esq.--check no. 1247.
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18088
09/07/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/20/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-19375
09/26/2006Other Other. Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Docketing Statement. 06-19697
09/29/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Appellant's Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, and Case Appeal Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-20015
10/03/2006Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 06-20267
11/09/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-23098
12/18/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 16, 2007. Settlement Judge requests an extension of time to complete the settlement process. 06-25737
12/29/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The settlement judge shall have until March 6, 2007, to file a final settlement conference status report. 06-26641
01/30/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 1, 2007. 07-02427
03/05/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-05209
03/14/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Courtesy Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines. 07-05933
03/15/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Reinstating Briefing pursuant to NRAP 3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing the fast track statement and response pursuant to NRAP 3E. Appellant: 10 days to comply with NRAP 3E(c)(2); 40 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from the service of appellant's fast track statement to file and serve the fast track response. 07-06082
03/28/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/16/06. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 07-06998
04/25/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 1, 2007. 07-09249
04/26/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 16, 2006. Court Reporter: Shelly A. Ajoub. 07-09316
05/03/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-09898
05/03/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-09902
05/03/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix. 07-09903
05/07/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Fast Track Statement and Appendix. 07-10126
05/24/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-11475
05/24/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 07-11476
06/01/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Fast Track Response. 07-12082
06/14/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. for Leave to File Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Fast Track Response. 07-13082
06/21/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file a reply. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file a reply. 07-13516
07/05/2007Other Other. Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response. 07-14681
09/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's modification order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 07-19837
10/05/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-20195
10/05/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/16/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2007. 07-20195