judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

APTBP, LLC d/b/a Bay Pointe Apartments and Gatesco, Inc. v. The City of Baytown

Case: 14-17-00183-CV
14-17-00183-CV
03/09/2017
Governmental Immunity
APTBP, LLC d/b/a Bay Pointe Apartments and Gatesco, Inc.
The City of Baytown
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
05/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/31/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/19/2019Case stored
02/19/2019Mandate issued
02/19/2019Mandate due to be issued
01/25/2019Petition for review was not filed
01/25/2019Petition for review due in Supreme Court
12/11/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedDENIED
12/11/2018Motion for rehearing disposedDENIED
11/28/2018Motion for rehearing filed
11/28/2018Motion for rehearing due
11/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGRANTED
11/05/2018Motion for rehearing due
11/02/2018Petition for review due in Supreme Court
10/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
10/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGRANTED
10/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
10/03/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/03/2018Motion for rehearing due
09/18/2018Judgment Issued
09/18/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/13/2017Submitted
10/26/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
05/05/2017Case ready to be set
05/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/05/2017Appellees brief due
05/05/2017Reporters record due
05/05/2017Record due
05/01/2017Appellees brief due
04/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/03/2017Reporters record filed
04/03/2017Response due
03/31/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/24/2017Amended notice of appeal filed
03/24/2017Fee paid
03/24/2017Past due court fee notice
03/24/2017Docketing statement due
03/24/2017Mediation docketing statement due
03/22/2017Mediation docketing statement returned
03/19/2017Court fee due
03/14/2017Clerks record filed
03/13/2017Docketing statement filed
03/13/2017Amended notice of appeal filed
03/09/2017Letter issued by the court
03/09/2017Letter issued by the court
03/09/2017Case began in court of appeals
03/08/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court
03/06/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/19/2019Case StoredCase stored
02/19/2025RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The City of BaytownAppelleeJohn J. Hightower
Allison S. Killian
APTBP, LLC d/b/a Bay Pointe Apartments AppellantSteven Doyle Poock
Gatesco, Inc.AppellantThomas C. Sanders  
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable Judge, County Civil Court At Law No. 3
1079024
Laura Cutherell