judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5102
B-5102
02/18/1975
Application for Writ of Error
RUBY LEE NELSON DEVEROEX GUARDIAN OF EDWIN H. NELSON, A MINOR
ZAN A. NELSON AND THE ESTATE OF CAIN H. NELSON, JR., DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/17/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/05/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
02/18/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/1975Dissenting opinion issued.
10/29/1975Opinion issued
05/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/17/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/05/1975Response to Petition
02/18/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/18/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zan A. Nelson and the Estate of Cain H. Nelson, Jr., deceasedRespondent
Donn C. FullenweiderAmicus Curiae
Ruby Lee Nelson Deveroex Guardian of Edwin H. Nelson, a minorPetitioner
David C. RedfordAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information